Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 03/15/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 03/15/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 03/15/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 03/15/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 03/18/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/18/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 03/18/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 03/18/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/18/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 03/20/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 03/21/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 03/21/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/09/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/10/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 04/10/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 04/11/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 04/15/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/15/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/15/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/15/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/15/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 04/15/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 04/15/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/15/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 04/16/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 04/16/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 04/16/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/23/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/26/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/03/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 05/03/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/03/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 05/06/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 05/06/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 05/06/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 05/06/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 05/07/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 05/07/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 05/07/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 05/07/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 05/09/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 05/09/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/14/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 05/15/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 05/15/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/15/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/16/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 05/17/2013