Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 08/02/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/11/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/11/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/11/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/30/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 09/30/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 09/30/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 09/30/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 09/30/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 09/30/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/30/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 09/30/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 12/10/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 12/10/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 12/10/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 12/10/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 12/10/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/10/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/10/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 12/10/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 12/10/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 12/10/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 12/10/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 12/10/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 12/10/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 12/10/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 12/10/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 12/10/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 12/12/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31] 12/12/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 12/12/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 12/19/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 12/19/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 12/19/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 12/19/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 01/09/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/09/2014
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 01/09/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 01/13/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 01/13/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 01/13/2014
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 01/27/2014
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 01/27/2014
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 01/27/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 01/27/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 01/27/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 01/27/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 02/03/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 02/03/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/03/2014
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/03/2014
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 02/03/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/03/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/25/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/25/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/25/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 03/05/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 03/05/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 03/05/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/11/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/11/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 03/11/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 03/24/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 03/24/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/24/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 03/27/2014
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 03/27/2014