Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 08/02/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 08/02/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 08/02/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 08/02/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 09/12/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 10/16/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/02/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/10/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 12/19/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 02/25/2014
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/24/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/24/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/02/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/02/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/02/2014