Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4]* 08/02/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 09/27/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 10/11/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 12/11/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/21/2014
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 03/10/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew