Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 08/01/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 08/01/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 08/01/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/10/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 09/10/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 09/10/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 10/02/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 10/02/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 10/22/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/22/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 10/30/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 10/30/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 10/30/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 12/11/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/12/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 03/12/2014