Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 10/22/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 10/30/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 11/18/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 01/07/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 01/07/2014
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 01/07/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 01/16/2014
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 02/05/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 04/10/2014