Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/18/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 09/18/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 09/18/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 09/18/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/18/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/18/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/23/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/23/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 09/28/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 09/28/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/28/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 10/15/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/15/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 10/15/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/15/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 11/13/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 11/13/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 11/13/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 11/13/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 11/13/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 12/19/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 12/19/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/19/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/14/2014
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 03/14/2014
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 03/14/2014
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/14/2014
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/14/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 03/24/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/24/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/26/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/26/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/26/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/01/2014
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 04/10/2014