Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 09/17/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 10/11/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 03/27/2014
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 04/01/2014
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 04/01/2014