Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 09/25/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 10/08/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/22/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 10/22/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 10/22/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 11/12/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 12/05/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 12/11/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/12/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/25/2014