Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 09/10/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 09/19/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 09/19/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 09/25/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 09/25/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 09/25/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/03/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 10/03/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 10/30/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 10/30/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 11/15/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 11/15/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 11/15/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/15/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/15/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 11/15/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/18/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 11/18/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 11/20/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 12/10/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 12/12/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 12/12/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 12/19/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 12/19/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 12/19/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 01/15/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 01/15/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/27/2014
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 01/27/2014
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 01/27/2014
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 01/27/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 02/10/2014
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 02/10/2014
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 02/10/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 02/10/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/27/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 02/27/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 04/04/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew