Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 09/19/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 09/19/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/04/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 11/13/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 02/10/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/11/2014