Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 08/02/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/11/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 09/11/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 09/11/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/11/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 09/11/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 09/11/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 09/11/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/11/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 09/11/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/11/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/25/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/25/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 10/04/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/04/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 10/04/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 10/04/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 10/04/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 10/04/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 10/04/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 10/28/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/28/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 10/28/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/14/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 11/14/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 12/02/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 12/03/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 12/05/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 01/08/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 01/28/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 02/03/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/21/2014
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 02/28/2014