Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 08/01/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 08/01/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/20/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 09/20/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 10/09/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 10/16/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/22/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 11/12/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 11/13/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 11/14/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/14/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/15/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/15/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/15/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/15/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 11/15/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 11/15/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/15/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 11/15/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/15/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/15/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 11/15/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 11/15/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 11/15/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 11/15/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 11/15/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 11/15/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 11/15/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/15/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 11/15/2013
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 11/15/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/15/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 11/15/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 11/15/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 11/15/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 11/15/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 11/15/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 11/15/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 11/15/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/15/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 11/15/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/15/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/18/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/18/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 11/18/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 11/22/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 12/05/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 04/03/2014