Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 08/02/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 08/02/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/09/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/12/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 09/12/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 09/19/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/19/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/19/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 09/27/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 09/27/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 10/08/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 12/04/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 12/04/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 12/04/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 12/04/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 12/04/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 12/04/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 12/16/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 01/14/2014
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/14/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 01/14/2014
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 02/06/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/06/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/06/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 02/06/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/06/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/25/2014
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 03/06/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 03/06/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 03/13/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/14/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/14/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/14/2014
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/14/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 03/24/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/24/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 03/24/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 03/24/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 03/24/2014
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 03/24/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 03/24/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/24/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 03/27/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/27/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 03/27/2014
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/27/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/27/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/27/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 04/08/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 04/08/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/08/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 04/08/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 04/08/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 04/08/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/10/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 04/10/2014