Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 09/09/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 09/09/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 09/09/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 09/09/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 09/09/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 09/26/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 09/26/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 09/27/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 10/01/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 10/22/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 10/29/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 11/12/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 11/12/2013