Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 07/31/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/31/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 07/31/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/10/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 10/10/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 12/02/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 12/02/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 01/09/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 01/14/2014