Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 10/23/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 10/29/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 11/13/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 11/13/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 11/20/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 11/20/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 11/21/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 12/11/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 12/11/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/14/2014