Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 08/02/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 01/08/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/05/2014
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 03/21/2014