Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 07/30/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/30/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 07/30/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 08/01/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 08/01/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 08/01/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 08/01/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 08/01/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 08/02/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 10/23/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 10/23/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 12/19/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/19/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 12/19/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 12/19/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 12/19/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 12/19/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 12/19/2013