Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 07/25/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 10/30/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/09/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/10/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/25/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/25/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/08/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/08/2014