Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/30/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/31/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 08/01/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 08/02/2013