Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 07/25/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 07/25/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/26/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/30/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 08/01/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 08/01/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 08/01/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 08/02/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 08/02/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 09/10/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/28/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 10/28/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/28/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 11/12/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 11/12/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 11/15/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 12/16/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/27/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 03/06/2014
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/13/2014
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 03/24/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/24/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 03/26/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 04/03/2014