Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/14/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/27/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 07/15/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/23/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/30/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 08/01/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 02/26/2014