Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 07/30/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 08/01/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 08/02/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 08/02/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 08/02/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 08/02/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 08/02/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 08/02/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 08/02/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 08/02/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 08/02/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 08/02/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 08/02/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 08/02/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 08/02/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 08/02/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 08/02/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 08/02/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 08/02/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 08/02/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 08/02/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 08/02/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 08/02/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 08/02/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 08/02/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 08/02/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 08/02/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 09/12/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 09/12/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 09/12/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/12/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 09/12/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 09/12/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 09/12/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 09/12/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 09/12/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/12/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 09/12/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 09/12/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/12/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 09/12/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/17/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/17/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 09/17/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 09/17/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 09/18/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 09/18/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/18/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 09/18/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 09/18/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 09/18/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 09/18/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/18/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/18/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 09/18/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 09/18/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 09/18/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 09/18/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/19/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/19/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/19/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/19/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 09/19/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 09/19/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/19/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/19/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 09/19/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 09/19/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/19/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 09/19/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/19/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 09/20/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 09/20/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/20/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/20/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/20/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/20/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 09/25/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 09/25/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 09/25/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/25/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 09/25/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/25/2013
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 09/25/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 09/25/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 09/25/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 09/25/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 09/26/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/26/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 09/26/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 09/26/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 09/26/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 09/26/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 09/26/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 09/26/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 09/26/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 09/26/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/27/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 09/27/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 09/27/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 09/27/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 09/27/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 09/27/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 09/27/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 09/27/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/27/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 09/27/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/30/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 10/01/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 11/12/2013