Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 07/24/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 07/24/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/24/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 07/24/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 07/24/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 07/24/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4]* 07/24/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 07/24/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 07/24/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 07/24/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/25/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/30/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/30/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 09/10/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 09/12/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 10/02/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/10/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 10/10/2013
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 10/15/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 10/16/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 11/13/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 11/13/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 11/13/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 11/13/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 11/15/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/15/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 11/21/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 11/21/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 12/02/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 12/02/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 12/02/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 12/12/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 12/12/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 12/12/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 12/12/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 12/12/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 12/12/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 12/23/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 01/07/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 01/07/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 01/14/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 01/14/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 01/14/2014
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 01/14/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 01/14/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 01/21/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/05/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/11/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 03/21/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/24/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 03/24/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/26/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/26/2014
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/03/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 04/04/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 04/04/2014
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/07/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 04/07/2014