Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 09/10/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 09/27/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/10/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 01/27/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/10/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/25/2014
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 02/25/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 02/25/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/27/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 03/24/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/01/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 04/10/2014