Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 07/22/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 08/01/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 08/01/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 08/01/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 09/10/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/10/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 09/10/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 09/10/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/17/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 10/23/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-6] 11/13/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 11/13/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 12/03/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 12/12/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 02/27/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew