Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 07/22/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/25/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/25/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/25/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/25/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 07/25/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 07/25/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 07/25/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 07/25/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 08/02/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 08/02/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 08/02/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 08/02/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 08/02/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 08/02/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 08/02/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 08/02/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 08/02/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 09/18/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/18/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 09/18/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/18/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/18/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/18/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/18/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/18/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 09/18/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 09/26/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/26/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 10/09/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/09/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 10/09/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/09/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 10/29/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 10/29/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 10/29/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/29/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 10/29/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 10/29/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/30/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 10/30/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 11/13/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 11/13/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 11/13/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 11/13/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 11/22/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 11/22/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 11/22/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 11/22/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 11/22/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 11/22/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 12/10/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 12/10/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 12/16/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 01/09/2014
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 02/03/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 02/04/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/25/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 02/25/2014
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 04/09/2014