Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 07/22/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 07/22/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 07/22/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 07/22/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 07/24/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/24/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 07/24/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 07/24/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 07/26/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/26/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/26/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 07/30/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/31/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 08/02/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 08/02/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 09/23/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 09/25/2013