Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/24/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 07/24/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/24/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 07/24/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 07/24/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 07/25/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 07/25/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/25/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 07/25/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/25/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 07/25/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 07/25/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 07/25/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/25/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/25/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 07/25/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/25/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 07/25/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 07/25/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/25/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/25/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 07/25/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/25/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 07/25/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 07/25/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/25/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 07/25/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 07/25/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 07/25/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/25/2013
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/25/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/25/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 07/25/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/25/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 07/25/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/25/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 07/25/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 07/25/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/25/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 07/25/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 07/25/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 07/25/2013
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 07/25/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 07/30/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/30/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 07/30/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/30/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 07/30/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/30/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 07/30/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/30/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/30/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/30/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/31/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 07/31/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/31/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/31/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/31/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 07/31/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/31/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/31/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/31/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 07/31/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 07/31/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/31/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/31/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 07/31/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 07/31/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 07/31/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 07/31/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 08/01/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 08/01/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 08/01/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 08/01/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 08/01/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 08/01/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 08/01/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 08/01/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 08/01/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 08/01/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 08/01/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 08/01/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 08/02/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 08/02/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 08/02/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 08/02/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 08/02/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 08/02/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 09/09/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 09/09/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 09/09/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 09/09/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/09/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 09/09/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/09/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 09/09/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/10/2013