Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/25/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 07/25/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 07/25/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/25/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 07/30/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 07/30/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 07/30/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/31/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/31/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 08/02/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 08/02/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 08/02/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 08/02/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/09/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 09/09/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 09/09/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 09/09/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 09/09/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 09/09/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 09/09/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 09/09/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 09/09/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/09/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 09/12/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/12/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/18/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 09/18/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 09/20/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 09/20/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/25/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 09/25/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 09/30/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/11/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/22/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 10/22/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 11/12/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/14/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 12/05/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/26/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/05/2014
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/06/2014
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/14/2014