Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 07/18/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 09/10/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/18/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/02/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 10/29/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 01/15/2014
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 01/15/2014