Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 07/18/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 07/18/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 07/18/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/18/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 07/18/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 07/18/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/18/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/18/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 08/02/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 08/02/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 09/18/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 10/09/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/20/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 12/16/2013
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 01/27/2014