Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 09/17/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 09/27/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 09/30/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/18/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 03/18/2014