Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 01/18/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 01/18/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 01/18/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 01/18/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 01/23/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 01/23/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 01/23/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 02/08/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 02/08/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 02/08/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/12/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/12/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 02/12/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 02/12/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 02/12/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 02/12/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 02/12/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 02/13/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 02/14/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 02/14/2013