Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/03/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 10/04/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 11/15/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 12/10/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 01/07/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/07/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/07/2014