Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 07/23/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 07/23/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/23/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 07/23/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/31/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 07/31/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/31/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/31/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/31/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 07/31/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 07/31/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 07/31/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 07/31/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 08/01/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 08/01/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 08/01/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 08/01/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 08/01/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 08/02/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 08/02/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/10/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/10/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 09/10/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 09/10/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 09/10/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 09/12/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 09/12/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 09/17/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 09/17/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 09/17/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/17/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 09/18/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/26/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 09/26/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 09/26/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/26/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 10/08/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/08/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 10/08/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 10/22/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/22/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/22/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/28/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 10/28/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 10/28/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 10/28/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 10/28/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/28/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/30/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/30/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 11/12/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 11/12/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 11/13/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 11/19/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 11/19/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 11/19/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 11/22/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 12/02/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 12/02/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 12/02/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 12/02/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 12/04/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 12/12/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 12/12/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 01/09/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/26/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 03/12/2014
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 04/10/2014