Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 06/06/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 06/06/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/06/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 06/06/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/06/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 06/06/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/06/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/06/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/06/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 06/06/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 06/06/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 06/06/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 06/06/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/06/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 06/06/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/06/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 06/06/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/06/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 06/06/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 06/06/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/06/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 06/06/2013
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/06/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 06/06/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 06/06/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 06/06/2013
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31] 06/06/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 06/06/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 06/06/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/06/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 06/06/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/06/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 06/06/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 06/06/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 06/06/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/06/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 06/11/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 06/11/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 06/11/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/11/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 06/13/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/13/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 06/13/2013
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-34] 06/13/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 06/13/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 06/13/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 06/13/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/13/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/13/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 06/18/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 06/18/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 06/18/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 06/18/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 06/18/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 06/19/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-23] 06/19/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 06/20/2013
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 06/20/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 06/20/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 10/23/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 10/23/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/23/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/23/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/23/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/23/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 10/23/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/28/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/28/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 10/28/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/28/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/28/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/28/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 10/28/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 10/28/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 10/28/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 10/28/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/28/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/28/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/28/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/28/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 10/28/2013