Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9]* 07/17/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 07/17/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/24/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 01/10/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 01/15/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/04/2014