Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-34]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/18/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/18/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/18/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/09/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/09/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/16/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 09/20/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/01/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 10/01/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 10/02/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 10/04/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/08/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 10/10/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 10/10/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/10/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 10/11/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/22/2013
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 10/22/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/22/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/23/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 10/23/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 10/28/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/28/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/28/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/12/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/13/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 11/14/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 11/14/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/19/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 11/19/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 11/19/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 11/20/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 11/20/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 12/04/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 12/05/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 12/09/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 12/10/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 03/27/2014