Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 07/17/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 07/17/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 07/17/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 07/17/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/17/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/17/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 07/17/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 07/17/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/17/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/17/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 07/17/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/17/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 07/17/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 07/17/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 07/17/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/17/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 07/17/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/17/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/17/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 07/17/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 07/17/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 07/17/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/17/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 07/17/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 07/17/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 07/18/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 07/18/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/18/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/18/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 07/19/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 08/01/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/19/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 10/04/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 12/12/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 01/09/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 02/03/2014
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 02/11/2014