Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/17/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/24/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 07/24/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/25/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/25/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 07/25/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/25/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 07/25/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/30/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/30/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 07/30/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/30/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 07/30/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/30/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/31/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 08/02/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 09/12/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/12/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 09/12/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 09/12/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/12/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 09/12/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 09/12/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 09/17/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 09/17/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/17/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 09/18/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/20/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 09/26/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 09/26/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 10/03/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 10/03/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 10/03/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/10/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 10/22/2013
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 10/22/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 10/30/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 12/03/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 12/03/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/05/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/05/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 12/05/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 12/11/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 01/08/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/08/2014
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 01/15/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 01/29/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/29/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/05/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/11/2014
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/25/2014
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/25/2014
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/25/2014
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/02/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 04/09/2014