Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 07/16/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/17/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 07/22/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 08/01/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 09/10/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 11/12/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/20/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 01/07/2014