Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 07/16/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/17/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/17/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 07/17/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 07/17/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 07/17/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/17/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/17/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 07/17/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 07/17/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 07/17/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/17/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 07/18/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/18/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 07/22/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/31/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 09/09/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 09/11/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/19/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 10/23/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 10/23/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 10/23/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 11/12/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 01/10/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 02/25/2014