Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 01/15/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24]* 01/15/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/15/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 02/05/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/05/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 02/05/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 02/14/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/11/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 04/18/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/26/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/16/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 12/05/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 01/13/2014