Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 07/11/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 07/17/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/19/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/19/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/22/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 07/23/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 07/23/2013