Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 07/16/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/16/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/16/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 07/16/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 07/16/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/16/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 07/16/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 07/16/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 07/16/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/16/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/16/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/17/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/17/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 07/17/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/17/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 07/19/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 07/19/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/19/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 10/04/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/23/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 10/30/2013