Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 07/16/2013
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/16/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/23/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/23/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 07/23/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 07/25/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/30/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/30/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 08/01/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 08/02/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/10/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 09/17/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 09/17/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/17/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 09/18/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/19/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/19/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/26/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/07/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 10/16/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 10/24/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 10/28/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 10/29/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 11/15/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/15/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 11/15/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/15/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 11/18/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 11/19/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 11/21/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 12/02/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 12/04/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 12/09/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 12/09/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 12/09/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 12/09/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 12/09/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 12/09/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/11/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/11/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 12/12/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 12/12/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 12/12/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 12/12/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 12/16/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 01/07/2014
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 01/15/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 01/28/2014
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 01/28/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/25/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 02/25/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/26/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/05/2014
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 03/10/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/24/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 03/24/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/27/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/04/2014
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/04/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 04/09/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/09/2014