Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 07/10/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 07/16/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 07/16/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 07/16/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/16/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 07/16/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 07/16/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 07/16/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 07/16/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 07/16/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 07/16/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/17/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 07/17/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 07/17/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/17/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/17/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 07/17/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 07/17/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 07/17/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 07/19/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 07/24/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 09/12/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 09/12/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/25/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 10/08/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 12/12/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 12/19/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 12/19/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 12/19/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 01/10/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 01/10/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 01/10/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 01/27/2014
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 01/28/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 01/28/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 01/31/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/31/2014
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 01/31/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/31/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/27/2014
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/27/2014