Refine your search

Date Major Actions
02/07/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-79.
02/07/2014 Signed by President.
02/04/2014 Presented to President.
02/04/2014 Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report by Yea-Nay Vote. 68 - 32. Record Vote Number: 21.
01/29/2014 Conference report agreed to in House: On agreeing to the conference report Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 251 - 166 (Roll no. 31).(consideration: CR H1500-1501)
01/27/2014 Conference report filed: Conference report H. Rept. 113-333 filed.(text of conference report: CR H1269-1425)
10/01/2013 Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate disagreed to the House amendment to Senate amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7084-7085)
09/28/2013 Resolving differences -- House actions: House agreed to Senate amendment with an amendment pursuant to H.Res. 361.(consideration: CR H5945-5946)
08/01/2013 To conference: Senate appointed conferees Stabenow; Leahy; Harkin; Baucus; Brown; Klobuchar; Bennet; Cochran; Chambliss; Roberts; Boozman; Hoeven.(consideration: CR S6259-62660)
07/18/2013 Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate insisted on its amendment, requested a conference.(consideration: CR S5794)
07/18/2013 To conference: Senate insisted on its amendment, requested a conference.(consideration: CR S5794)
07/18/2013 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
07/11/2013 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 216 - 208 (Roll no. 353).(text: CR H4395-4458)
07/10/2013 Introduced in House